Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Aliaksei Yanchylik | 12.08.2009 | 23.04.2013 | direktion |
Alan Hovgaard | 20.03.2007 | 12.08.2009 | direktion |
Mohammad Zoraiz Iqbal | 21.02.2007 | 20.03.2007 | adm. dir |
Hussain Khan | 03.02.2004 | 21.02.2007 | direktion |
Kim Madsen | 01.01.2004 | 03.02.2004 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Aliaksei Yanchylik | 02.09.2009 | 23.04.2013 | bestyrelse |
Mohmmad Imran Khan | 20.03.2007 | 02.09.2009 | bestyrelse |
Alan Hovgaard | 20.03.2007 | 02.09.2009 | bestyrelse |
Fawaz Abdel Aziz Al-Alousi | 23.01.2007 | 01.04.2008 | formand |
Hussain Khan | 23.01.2007 | 20.03.2007 | bestyrelse |
Mohammad Zoraiz Iqbal | 23.01.2007 | 20.03.2007 | bestyrelse |
Imtiaz Ahmed | 23.01.2007 | 20.03.2007 | bestyrelse |