Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Rasi Beckmann | 10.09.2010 | 21.01.2013 | direktion |
David Michael Erickson | 25.03.2009 | 10.09.2010 | direktion |
Henrik Fredericia | 04.08.2008 | 25.03.2009 | adm. dir |
Bo Steffan Nielsson | 01.01.2004 | 04.08.2008 | direktion |
John Rasi Beckmann | 01.01.2004 | 07.03.2006 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Skak Pedersen | 10.09.2010 | 21.01.2013 | bestyrelse |
Søren Bro | 10.09.2010 | 21.01.2013 | formand |
Bo Steffan Nielsson | 10.09.2010 | 10.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
David Michael Erickson | 25.03.2009 | 10.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Fredericia | 04.08.2008 | 25.03.2009 | bestyrelse |
Steen Gude | 22.04.2007 | 04.08.2008 | formand |
Michael Hofman Laursen | 07.03.2006 | 22.04.2007 | formand |
John Rasi Beckmann | 01.01.2004 | 21.01.2013 | bestyrelse |
Claus Højbjerg Andersen | 01.01.2004 | 07.03.2006 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Albertsen | 01.01.2004 | 07.03.2006 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Bitsch Lund | 01.01.2004 | 07.03.2006 | formand |