Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Skou | 04.04.2005 | 13.10.2011 | adm. dir |
Morten Blenker | 11.11.2003 | 04.04.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Robert Brink | 16.05.2008 | 13.10.2011 | bestyrelse |
Peter Skou | 27.11.2007 | 13.10.2011 | formand |
Thomas Lind Nielsen | 24.03.2006 | 13.10.2011 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Robert Brink | 03.10.2005 | 27.11.2007 | bestyrelse |
Peter Fredgaard | 03.10.2005 | 27.11.2007 | bestyrelse |
Erik Højsholt | 03.10.2005 | 27.11.2007 | formand |
Lars Skou | 04.04.2005 | 16.05.2008 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Ishøj Christensen | 04.04.2005 | 26.04.2007 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Robert Brink | 11.11.2003 | 04.04.2005 | bestyrelse |