Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tommy Vestergaard Pedersen | 03.05.2005 | 26.05.2011 | direktion |
Bent Lund Rasmussen | 26.07.2004 | 03.05.2005 | direktion |
Henrik Styrup | 28.10.2003 | 26.07.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Knud Erik Kastrup | 01.07.2010 | 26.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Heine Jakob Heinsvig | 01.07.2010 | 26.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Hessellund Arkil | 01.07.2010 | 26.05.2011 | formand |
Erik Sørensen | 11.03.2008 | 01.07.2010 | bestyrelse |
Eigil Windfeld Starup | 31.08.2007 | 01.07.2010 | bestyrelse |
Tommy Vestergaard Pedersen | 08.03.2007 | 01.07.2010 | bestyrelse |
Kristian Styrup | 16.03.2006 | 01.07.2010 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Styrup | 26.07.2004 | 01.07.2010 | formand |
Alex Nyboe | 26.07.2004 | 11.03.2008 | bestyrelse |
Peter Christensen | 19.11.2003 | 01.07.2010 | bestyrelse |
Gunnar Sund Pedersen | 28.10.2003 | 08.03.2007 | bestyrelse |