Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kent Venning Christensen | 29.10.2012 | 10.12.2013 | direktion |
Johnny Christian Andersen | 03.01.2007 | 29.10.2012 | direktion |
Niels Martin Venning Christensen | 28.10.2003 | 03.01.2007 | direktion |
Kent Venning Christensen | 28.10.2003 | 04.03.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Johnny Christian Andersen | 03.01.2007 | 29.10.2012 | bestyrelse |
Kent Venning Christensen | 03.01.2007 | 29.10.2012 | bestyrelse |
Niels Martin Venning Christensen | 03.01.2007 | 29.10.2012 | formand |