Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Vagn Arnold Sørensen | 03.12.2004 | 14.02.2012 | direktion |
John Aage Köhn | 03.12.2004 | 14.02.2012 | direktion |
Niels Nedergaard | 25.11.2003 | 14.02.2012 | direktion |
Annemette Heller | 23.10.2003 | 25.11.2003 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Vagn Arnold Sørensen | 25.11.2003 | 03.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
John Aage Köhn | 25.11.2003 | 03.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Ravnild | 25.11.2003 | 03.12.2004 | formand |
Kim Madsen | 23.10.2003 | 25.11.2003 | formand |