Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Frank Nielsen | 01.10.2007 | 11.02.2011 | direktion |
Tonny Skarby | 21.10.2003 | 01.10.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Frank Nielsen | 01.10.2007 | 11.02.2011 | bestyrelse |
Christian Petri | 01.10.2007 | 11.02.2011 | bestyrelse |
Tonny Skarby | 01.10.2007 | 11.02.2011 | formand |
Thomas Vang Christensen | 25.06.2007 | 01.10.2007 | bestyrelse |
Per Eriksen | 07.09.2006 | 25.06.2007 | bestyrelse |
Marie Marker | 20.06.2006 | 07.09.2006 | bestyrelse |