Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Jensen | 18.04.2007 | 28.04.2011 | direktion |
Poul Vilsgaard Kristensen | 10.10.2003 | 18.04.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Vilsgaard Kristensen | 18.04.2007 | 28.04.2011 | bestyrelse |
Ole Jensen | 18.04.2007 | 28.04.2011 | bestyrelse |
Hans Thordahl Lavridsen | 18.04.2007 | 14.02.2008 | bestyrelse |