Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torben Lundager | 30.12.2008 | 27.06.2011 | adm. dir |
Knud Renny Petersen | 06.12.2006 | 30.12.2008 | direktion |
Hans-Jørgen Christiansen | 10.12.2003 | 06.12.2006 | direktion |
Jan Jezewski Jensen | 13.11.2003 | 10.12.2003 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.10.2003 | 13.11.2003 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torben Lundager | 21.03.2009 | 27.06.2011 | bestyrelse |
Kenneth Urup Andersen | 21.03.2009 | 27.06.2011 | bestyrelse |
Hans Natorp | 21.03.2009 | 27.06.2011 | formand |