Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Torkil Christensen | 03.01.2007 | 04.06.2010 | direktion |
Brian Lang | 02.09.2003 | 03.01.2007 | direktion |
Annemette Heller | 08.07.2003 | 02.09.2003 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jesper Ransby Christensen | 03.01.2007 | 27.02.2007 | formand |
Torkil Christensen | 11.05.2005 | 27.02.2007 | bestyrelse |
René Lenhard Abraham | 11.05.2005 | 27.02.2007 | bestyrelse |
Claes Olaf de Meza Skjernov von Holstein-Rathlou | 11.05.2005 | 03.01.2007 | formand |
Jesper Ransby Christensen | 02.09.2003 | 11.05.2005 | bestyrelse |
Brian Lang | 02.09.2003 | 11.05.2005 | bestyrelse |
Kim Madsen | 08.07.2003 | 02.09.2003 | formand |