Bestyrelse | Dato | Rolle |
---|---|---|
Sebrina Saabye Blangstrup | 28.05.2019 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Betina Chanette Saabye Willert | 31.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Willert | 04.06.2003 | formand |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Else Marie Willert | 04.06.2003 | 20.06.2018 | bestyrelse |
Poul Christian Willert | 04.06.2003 | 31.12.2013 | bestyrelse |