Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jean-Didier Billeret | 21.05.2014 | 09.04.2015 | direktion |
David Mainguy | 19.05.2011 | 21.05.2014 | direktion |
Eric Jean-charles Denis Hervé | 21.10.2010 | 19.05.2011 | direktion |
Bjørn Lisbjerg | 01.10.2010 | 21.10.2010 | direktion |
Bo Hansen | 14.07.2003 | 01.10.2010 | direktion |
Steen Schierbeck | 01.07.2003 | 14.07.2003 | direktion |