Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tina Bagh Kristensen | 16.06.2003 | 31.01.2011 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tina Bagh Kristensen | 14.04.2005 | 10.03.2010 | bestyrelse |
Catharina Vinther Engqvist | 14.04.2005 | 10.03.2010 | bestyrelse |
Claus Christensen | 14.04.2005 | 10.03.2010 | formand |