Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Frederik Barfoed | 04.06.2013 | 18.12.2013 | adm. dir |
Jørn Beier | 01.10.2009 | 18.12.2013 | direktion |
Mads Peter Møller | 08.09.2008 | 01.10.2009 | direktion |
Niels Olesen | 26.05.2003 | 01.10.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Frederik Barfoed | 04.06.2013 | 18.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Rolf Harald Barfoed | 01.10.2009 | 18.12.2013 | formand |
Niels Sigurd Wegener | 16.02.2006 | 04.06.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Beier | 16.02.2006 | 01.10.2009 | formand |
Lise Barfoed | 26.05.2003 | 18.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Camilla Barfoed | 26.05.2003 | 28.05.2012 | bestyrelse |
Rolf Harald Barfoed | 26.05.2003 | 16.02.2006 | bestyrelse |
Frederik Barfoed | 26.05.2003 | 16.02.2006 | formand |