Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mikael Viberg Rohde | 15.04.2005 | 19.10.2009 | direktion |
Mogens Peter Madsen | 08.05.2003 | 15.04.2005 | direktion |
Tom Helligsøe | 08.05.2003 | 15.04.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mikael Viberg Rohde | 15.04.2005 | 10.04.2006 | bestyrelse |
Tina Viberg Rohde | 15.04.2005 | 10.04.2006 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Peter Madsen | 08.05.2003 | 15.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Tom Helligsøe | 08.05.2003 | 15.04.2005 | bestyrelse |