Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gitte Rindalsholt | 06.04.2011 | 15.04.2013 | bestyrelse |
Peter Schak Larsen | 26.10.2010 | 15.04.2013 | formand |
Martin Vang Hansen | 22.05.2008 | 15.04.2013 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Nøhr Poulsen | 22.05.2008 | 15.04.2013 | bestyrelse |
Christian Møller | 23.03.2007 | 15.04.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jan-Ole Hansen | 23.03.2007 | 29.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Stig Poulsen | 24.02.2006 | 26.10.2010 | formand |
Henrik Nøhr Poulsen | 21.01.2005 | 23.03.2007 | bestyrelse |
Johnny Ewan Kronow | 13.05.2004 | 21.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Jacob Christen Estrup | 13.05.2004 | 29.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Finn Rossau Jensen | 13.05.2004 | 23.03.2007 | bestyrelse |
Hanne Coco Arildsen | 07.03.2003 | 24.02.2006 | formand |
Christian Møller | 07.03.2003 | 26.01.2005 | bestyrelse |
Poul Bukbjerg | 07.03.2003 | 13.05.2004 | bestyrelse |
Johannes Theodor Faghtmann | 07.03.2003 | 13.05.2004 | bestyrelse |