Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Edward Newcomb Burgess | 25.04.2003 | 17.09.2004 | direktion |
Caroline Sundorph Pontoppidan | 05.03.2003 | 25.04.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Frederick Newcomb Burgess | 02.04.2004 | 17.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Jess Tom Pedersen | 25.04.2003 | 17.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Michael Edward Newcomb Burgess | 25.04.2003 | 17.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Martin Mikael Glamann | 25.04.2003 | 02.04.2004 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Thal Jantzen | 05.03.2003 | 25.04.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Kjergaard Madsen | 05.03.2003 | 25.04.2003 | bestyrelse |
Caroline Sundorph Pontoppidan | 05.03.2003 | 25.04.2003 | bestyrelse |