Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Jørgen Hæstrup | 01.05.2005 | 06.04.2006 | adm. dir |
Katja Marianne Ludwig Østergaard | 01.12.2003 | 01.05.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Katja Marianne Ludwig Østergaard | 01.12.2003 | 01.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Peter Jørgen Hæstrup | 31.01.2003 | 01.12.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Winther | 31.01.2003 | 01.12.2003 | bestyrelse |