Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Arent Madsen | 27.01.2006 | 24.06.2009 | direktion |
Claus Rosenfeldt | 07.03.2003 | 27.01.2006 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Dieckmann Nielsen | 09.03.2003 | 24.06.2009 | bestyrelse |
Peter Arent Madsen | 09.03.2003 | 24.06.2009 | bestyrelse |
Michael Vinther | 07.03.2003 | 24.06.2009 | formand |
Andreas Antoniades | 07.03.2003 | 09.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Johan Henrik Weihe | 07.03.2003 | 09.03.2003 | bestyrelse |