Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Laila Lund | 01.11.2007 | 04.01.2010 | direktion |
Carsten Hinsch | 02.03.2007 | 31.10.2007 | direktion |
Alexander Høgh Eriksen | 01.01.2003 | 04.01.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Theinert | 19.05.2009 | 04.01.2010 | bestyrelse |
Bernhard Norbert Quendt | 19.05.2009 | 04.01.2010 | formand |
Steen Nørby Nielsen | 14.11.2008 | 04.01.2010 | bestyrelse |
Frank Gerken | 14.11.2008 | 19.05.2009 | bestyrelse |
Christoph Otto Alfred Klose | 14.11.2008 | 19.05.2009 | formand |
Claus Møller | 02.03.2007 | 14.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Tim Felix Gabriel | 02.03.2007 | 14.11.2008 | formand |