Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Bo Lindahl | 30.08.2006 | 27.11.2007 | direktion |
Arent Christian Kjær | 01.03.2006 | 31.05.2006 | direktion |
Eduardus Johannes Maria Vleugels | 31.10.2005 | 27.11.2007 | direktion |
Theodorus Johannes Franciscus Thuis | 31.10.2005 | 27.11.2007 | direktion |
Johan Juncker | 31.10.2005 | 30.08.2006 | direktion |
Michael Anders Dreyer | 24.06.2003 | 31.10.2005 | direktion |
Johan Juncker | 24.06.2003 | 31.10.2005 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.01.2003 | 24.06.2003 | adm. dir |