Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ruth Tjagvad Madsen | 29.06.2004 | 24.06.2015 | direktion |
Lone Ernø Madsen | 29.06.2004 | 31.12.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Sandra Tjagvad Christensen | 15.04.2009 | 24.06.2015 | bestyrelse |
Steen Hoffskov Madsen | 15.04.2009 | 24.06.2015 | formand |
Ruth Tjagvad Madsen | 29.06.2004 | 24.06.2015 | bestyrelse |
Lone Ernø Madsen | 29.06.2004 | 15.04.2009 | bestyrelse |
Finn Hoffskov Madsen | 29.06.2004 | 15.04.2009 | formand |
Eva Korsholm | 29.06.2004 | 01.09.2008 | bestyrelse |