Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Færch | 25.04.2013 | 16.10.2019 | formand |
Poul Friis Hansen | 25.04.2008 | 25.04.2013 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Dahlgaard Bunk | 30.05.2006 | 25.04.2013 | formand |
Hans Thomsen Westergaard | 19.12.2002 | 16.10.2019 | bestyrelse |
Kim Nielsen | 19.12.2002 | 16.10.2019 | næstformand |
Niels Erik Knudsen | 19.12.2002 | 30.04.2006 | bestyrelse |
Ole Færch | 19.12.2002 | 21.04.2006 | formand |
Hans Krüger Troelsen | 19.12.2002 | 05.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Andreas Christiansen | 19.12.2002 | 01.01.2004 | bestyrelse |