Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Heini Nielsen | 20.12.2002 | 12.11.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Heini Nielsen | 29.01.2007 | 12.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Janni Bitsch Iversen | 29.01.2007 | 12.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Sascha Mark Andersen | 29.01.2007 | 30.06.2008 | bestyrelse |