Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Frands-Jacob Kisum Hansen | 16.12.2002 | 15.04.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Nicolas Göttsche Maravelakis | 16.12.2002 | 27.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Kaare Joshva Johansen | 16.12.2002 | 16.05.2004 | bestyrelse |
Frands-Jacob Kisum Hansen | 16.12.2002 | 15.04.2004 | bestyrelse |