Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Kurt Larsen | 08.04.2004 | 11.11.2008 | direktion |
Annemette Heller | 04.12.2002 | 22.01.2003 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Kurt Larsen | 29.05.2008 | 11.11.2008 | formand |
Henrik Thomas Larsen | 08.04.2004 | 29.05.2008 | formand |
Inger Margrethe Larsen | 22.01.2003 | 11.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
John Bo Larsen | 22.01.2003 | 29.05.2008 | bestyrelse |
Kim Madsen | 04.12.2002 | 22.01.2003 | formand |