Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Eigil Hannestad | 28.11.2011 | 15.01.2020 | bestyrelse |
Per Koefoed Als | 28.11.2011 | 15.01.2020 | formand |
Poul Hansen | 19.05.2010 | 15.01.2020 | bestyrelse |
Jens Møller-Christensen | 22.04.2009 | 28.11.2011 | formand |
Jesper Rasmussen | 24.03.2003 | 19.05.2010 | bestyrelse |
Stig Meno Farholt | 24.03.2003 | 22.04.2009 | formand |
Carsten Pedersen Rise | 30.10.2002 | 24.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Kim Sonne | 30.10.2002 | 24.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Lars Olsen | 30.10.2002 | 24.03.2003 | bestyrelse |