Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hong Wu | 04.05.2005 | 05.12.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Patrick Yuk Fai Tsang | 12.05.2005 | 05.12.2008 | formand |
Hong Wu | 04.05.2005 | 05.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
John Vincent | 01.04.2005 | 03.01.2007 | bestyrelse |
Yu-Hua Lin | 08.10.2004 | 01.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Allan Harm | 17.09.2002 | 01.04.2005 | bestyrelse |