Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Kristensen | 12.02.2008 | 10.04.2008 | direktion |
Peter Søndergaard | 20.08.2002 | 12.02.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Runo | 30.03.2005 | 10.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jens Rosenberg | 30.03.2005 | 10.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Henning Kristensen | 20.08.2002 | 10.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Niels Høisgaard | 20.08.2002 | 10.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Villy Anton Sørensen | 20.08.2002 | 30.03.2005 | bestyrelse |