Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Leif Alfred Christian Hartelius | 01.11.1969 | 25.02.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Benny Schwartz | 13.02.2004 | 15.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
Leif Alfred Christian Hartelius | 01.11.1969 | 15.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
Else Hartelius | 01.11.1969 | 15.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Krøigaard | 01.11.1969 | 13.02.2004 | bestyrelse |
Bente Hartelius | 01.11.1969 | 06.05.1991 | bestyrelse |