Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Moesgaard Kornmaaler | 31.10.2002 | 24.01.2011 | adm. dir |
Anne Charlotte Lindblad Kornmaaler | 05.07.2002 | 31.10.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anne Charlotte Lindblad Kornmaaler | 24.03.2004 | 24.01.2011 | bestyrelse |
Jürgen Karl Richard Helm | 15.10.2002 | 24.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Lars Moesgaard Kornmaaler | 05.07.2002 | 24.01.2011 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Engbjerg-Pedersen | 05.07.2002 | 27.06.2009 | formand |
Anne Charlotte Lindblad Kornmaaler | 05.07.2002 | 15.10.2002 | bestyrelse |