Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Nielsen | 02.12.2003 | 21.12.2010 | adm. dir |
Christina Samantha Johansen | 15.05.2003 | 02.12.2003 | direktion |
Thomas Nielsen | 03.04.2003 | 15.05.2003 | direktion |
Kirsten Speidel | 13.12.2002 | 03.04.2003 | adm. dir |
Steen Schierbeck | 01.07.2002 | 13.12.2002 | direktion |