Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Georg Harmens | 10.06.2002 | 26.07.2013 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Klindt | 19.12.2011 | 17.06.2013 | bestyrelse |
Georg Harmens | 28.05.2008 | 26.07.2013 | bestyrelse |
Helen Jannet Tokebjerg | 28.05.2008 | 26.07.2013 | formand |
Hans Kird Rasmussen | 28.05.2008 | 19.12.2011 | bestyrelse |