Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Hugo Beck-Kristensen | 20.06.2002 | 04.03.2019 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Fenstrup | 15.02.2017 | 04.03.2019 | formand |
Charlotte Fenstrup | 02.05.2016 | 14.02.2017 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Adam Gyula Laszlo Jarolics | 21.02.2013 | 02.05.2016 | formand |
Matteo Sharifzadeh Ekbatani | 10.07.2008 | 04.03.2019 | bestyrelse |
Hans Vagtborg | 10.07.2008 | 21.02.2013 | formand |
Per Hugo Beck-Kristensen | 20.06.2002 | 04.03.2019 | bestyrelse |