Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Liang Lou | 05.03.2004 | 01.03.2013 | direktion |
Troels Miltoft | 30.05.2002 | 05.03.2004 | direktion |
Peter Frank Hansen | 21.05.2002 | 30.05.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Liang Lou | 05.03.2004 | 05.03.2004 | formand |
Per Christensen | 09.10.2002 | 05.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Mads Balsby Wilkens | 09.10.2002 | 05.03.2004 | bestyrelse |
Weizheng Chen | 30.05.2002 | 05.12.2002 | formand |
Poul Thorup | 21.05.2002 | 09.10.2002 | bestyrelse |
Peter Frank Hansen | 21.05.2002 | 09.10.2002 | bestyrelse |
Hans Bekkevold | 21.05.2002 | 30.05.2002 | bestyrelse |