Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten Mølgaard | 30.09.2002 | 09.06.2004 | adm. dir |
Kent Benny Nielsen | 01.06.2002 | 30.09.2002 | direktion |
Steen Schierbeck | 01.04.2002 | 01.06.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bernhard-Josef Duna | 01.06.2002 | 09.06.2004 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Jensen Lehn | 01.06.2002 | 30.09.2002 | bestyrelse |