Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Palle Buhl Jørgensen | 14.08.2007 | 12.08.2008 | direktion |
Harald Johannsen | 18.02.2002 | 14.08.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Brejnbjerg Staaling | 18.02.2002 | 12.08.2008 | bestyrelse |
Palle Buhl Jørgensen | 18.02.2002 | 12.08.2008 | bestyrelse |
Lene Christensen | 18.02.2002 | 12.08.2008 | bestyrelse |
Finn Peter Bach | 18.02.2002 | 12.08.2008 | bestyrelse |
Ivan Ronald Kristensen | 18.02.2002 | 21.03.2005 | bestyrelse |