Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Asger Pring | 01.04.2003 | 13.12.2012 | direktion |
Gert Wagner Tvist | 18.12.2001 | 01.04.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Poulsen | 09.02.2005 | 23.09.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jakob Mandal Pring | 10.03.2004 | 13.12.2012 | bestyrelse |
Knud Dalgaard | 10.03.2004 | 09.02.2005 | formand |
Per Kirkegaard Hansen | 03.06.2003 | 10.03.2004 | formand |
Asger Pring | 18.12.2001 | 13.12.2012 | bestyrelse |
Mark Snoor Pring | 18.12.2001 | 13.12.2012 | bestyrelse |
Gert Wagner Tvist | 18.12.2001 | 01.04.2003 | bestyrelse |
Lis Tvist | 18.12.2001 | 01.04.2003 | bestyrelse |