Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gert Therbo Rieder | 26.03.2012 | 21.02.2013 | adm. dir |
Christian Laustrup | 25.10.2011 | 26.03.2012 | adm. dir |
André Smith-Nielsen | 24.09.2010 | 25.10.2011 | direktion |
Martin Sundahl | 26.11.2009 | 24.09.2010 | adm. dir |
Morten Bank Boldsen | 05.03.2007 | 26.11.2009 | adm. dir |
Joachim Lykke Dresner | 18.12.2001 | 05.03.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gert Therbo Rieder | 29.05.2012 | 21.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Christian Laustrup | 29.05.2012 | 21.02.2013 | formand |
Lilly Lærke Hesselholt | 25.10.2011 | 21.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Michael Clay Dickerson | 24.10.2011 | 29.05.2012 | formand |
Martin Sundahl | 12.11.2010 | 24.10.2011 | bestyrelse |
André Smith-Nielsen | 24.09.2010 | 25.10.2011 | bestyrelse |
Mads Roikjer | 24.09.2010 | 12.11.2010 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Parlov Aagaard | 26.11.2009 | 24.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Martin Sundahl | 05.03.2007 | 24.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Chris Østergaard Nielsen | 05.03.2007 | 26.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Morten Bank Boldsen | 05.03.2007 | 26.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Kristine Koed | 18.12.2001 | 05.03.2007 | bestyrelse |
Carl Lindhardt | 18.12.2001 | 05.03.2007 | bestyrelse |
Søren Glavind Lindhardt | 18.12.2001 | 05.03.2007 | bestyrelse |