Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Igor Vyssotski | 01.12.2004 | 20.04.2005 | adm. dir |
Michael Meyer | 15.11.2001 | 01.12.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Igor Vyssotski | 01.12.2004 | 20.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Sergey Solonin | 18.04.2002 | 20.04.2005 | bestyrelse |
Andrey Shatilov | 27.03.2002 | 20.04.2005 | formand |
Michael Meyer | 15.11.2001 | 01.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Bozena Janina Kaminska | 15.11.2001 | 18.04.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Madsen | 15.11.2001 | 27.03.2002 | bestyrelse |