Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Torstensson | 01.07.2003 | 10.03.2004 | direktion |
Thom Göthe Arnold Lindström | 01.04.2003 | 01.07.2003 | adm. dir |
Lars Torstensson | 18.03.2002 | 01.04.2003 | direktion |
Leila Trillingsgaard Hansen | 09.01.2002 | 18.03.2002 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.11.2001 | 09.01.2002 | direktion |