Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Lindblad | 17.01.2002 | 06.06.2007 | direktion |
Kim Madsen | 01.11.2001 | 17.01.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Eggen | 06.11.2006 | 06.06.2007 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Raunkjær | 06.11.2006 | 06.06.2007 | formand |
Svend Hollensen | 26.02.2004 | 06.06.2007 | bestyrelse |
Valerie Judith Navarro | 26.02.2004 | 25.10.2005 | bestyrelse |
Henning Lindblad | 17.01.2002 | 06.06.2007 | bestyrelse |
Bent Mogens Ove | 17.01.2002 | 03.08.2006 | bestyrelse |
Jens Ole Korch | 17.01.2002 | 22.05.2006 | formand |
Ole Lejbach | 17.01.2002 | 26.02.2004 | bestyrelse |
Allan Pilgaard-Jensen | 17.01.2002 | 26.02.2004 | bestyrelse |
Kim Madsen | 01.11.2001 | 17.01.2002 | bestyrelse |
Helle Garde Carlsen | 01.11.2001 | 17.01.2002 | bestyrelse |
Annemette Heller | 01.11.2001 | 17.01.2002 | formand |