Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Aksel Nielsen | 09.11.2001 | 14.06.2005 | direktion |
Kim Madsen | 01.10.2001 | 09.11.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Müller | 20.03.2002 | 14.06.2005 | formand |
Christian Frederik Harboe Wissum | 20.03.2002 | 10.04.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jens Langeland-Knudsen | 09.11.2001 | 14.06.2005 | bestyrelse |
Aksel Nielsen | 09.11.2001 | 14.06.2005 | bestyrelse |
Peter Müller | 09.11.2001 | 08.03.2002 | formand |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.10.2001 | 09.11.2001 | bestyrelse |