Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Georg Samsson Christensen | 15.06.2001 | 06.02.2013 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Samsson Christensen | 18.03.2005 | 06.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Kenneth Koch Christensen | 18.03.2005 | 06.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Georg Samsson Christensen | 15.06.2001 | 06.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Henny Elsebeth Christensen | 15.06.2001 | 06.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Eva Ebler Larsen | 15.06.2001 | 18.03.2005 | bestyrelse |
Tage Torngaard | 15.06.2001 | 24.10.2003 | bestyrelse |