Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Richard Witthoff Moberg | 14.05.2008 | 09.09.2013 | adm. dir |
Carina Moberg | 21.06.2001 | 14.05.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Richard Witthoff Moberg | 14.05.2008 | 09.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jane Mahrt | 14.05.2008 | 01.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Henrik Lund | 14.05.2008 | 01.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Steen Engholm | 14.05.2008 | 31.03.2010 | bestyrelse |