Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Erik Branebjerg | 07.06.2012 | 27.01.2016 | direktion |
Pia Hein Branebjerg | 31.05.2011 | 01.07.2011 | direktion |
Pia Hein Branebjerg | 15.06.2001 | 11.08.2010 | adm. dir |
Pia Hein Branebjerg | 15.06.2001 | 22.09.2008 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Erik Branebjerg | 01.07.2011 | 07.06.2012 | formand |
Jens Anders Branebjerg | 31.05.2011 | 07.06.2012 | bestyrelse |
Pia Hein Branebjerg | 31.05.2011 | 01.07.2011 | bestyrelse |
Arthur Heinrich Hein | 31.05.2011 | 01.07.2011 | bestyrelse |
Pia Hein Branebjerg | 15.06.2001 | 11.08.2010 | bestyrelse |
Jens Anders Branebjerg | 15.06.2001 | 11.08.2010 | bestyrelse |
Arthur Heinrich Hein | 15.06.2001 | 11.08.2010 | bestyrelse |
Pia Hein Branebjerg | 15.06.2001 | 22.09.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jens Anders Branebjerg | 15.06.2001 | 22.09.2008 | bestyrelse |
Arthur Heinrich Hein | 15.06.2001 | 22.09.2008 | bestyrelse |