Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Thostrup | 29.09.2004 | 15.11.2005 | adm. dir |
Peter Eckhardt | 17.01.2003 | 15.11.2005 | direktør |
Torben Ballegaard Sørensen | 18.02.2002 | 29.09.2004 | adm. dir |
Karsten Okholm Larsen | 18.02.2002 | 01.09.2002 | direktør |
Randi Toftlund Pedersen | 09.05.2001 | 18.02.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Randi Toftlund Pedersen | 29.09.2004 | 15.11.2005 | bestyrelse |
John Christian Bennett-Therkildsen | 29.09.2004 | 15.11.2005 | bestyrelse |
Kim Hyldahl Hansen | 29.09.2004 | 15.11.2005 | bestyrelse |
Torben Ballegaard Sørensen | 29.09.2004 | 15.11.2005 | formand |
Torsten Erik Rasmussen | 05.05.2003 | 29.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Peter Leschly | 18.02.2002 | 29.09.2004 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Worning | 18.02.2002 | 29.09.2004 | formand |
Jan Gesmar-Larsen | 18.02.2002 | 05.05.2003 | næstformand |
Peter Thostrup | 09.05.2001 | 15.11.2005 | bestyrelse |
Randi Toftlund Pedersen | 09.05.2001 | 18.02.2002 | bestyrelse |