Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Vigaynder Kumar Goel | 22.03.2001 | 04.02.2019 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Manu Juhani Goel | 25.11.2003 | 30.01.2019 | bestyrelse |
Steen Raagaard Andersen | 22.03.2001 | 30.01.2019 | bestyrelse |
Vigaynder Kumar Goel | 22.03.2001 | 30.01.2019 | bestyrelse |
Lis Mailo Mumgaard Holm | 22.03.2001 | 10.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
Khushdev Kumar Maini | 22.03.2001 | 25.11.2003 | bestyrelse |