Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Olof Göran Bertland | 07.12.2004 | 10.09.2010 | adm. dir |
Henning Davidsen | 26.03.2001 | 07.12.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Vagn Helberg | 25.05.2004 | 07.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Henning Davidsen | 30.04.2002 | 07.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Gerhard Strauss | 26.03.2001 | 07.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Hans Kirk | 26.03.2001 | 07.12.2004 | formand |
Finn Fastrup Nielsen | 26.03.2001 | 25.05.2004 | bestyrelse |