Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Mosegaard | 30.08.2002 | 16.11.2004 | direktion |
Henrik Hvistendal Hansen | 23.04.2001 | 30.08.2002 | direktion |
Erik Jensen | 20.03.2001 | 23.04.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Hartmann Mosegaard | 30.08.2002 | 16.11.2004 | formand |
Henrik Hvistendal Hansen | 05.12.2001 | 16.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Rathmann | 05.12.2001 | 26.09.2002 | bestyrelse |
Niels Mosegaard | 05.12.2001 | 30.08.2002 | formand |